BEDALE COMMUNITY MINIBUS

Charity number: 1158623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 01/11/2016 30/10/2017 01/11/2018 01/11/2019
Total gross income £20.91k £47.90k £47.90k £46.15k £20.99k
Total expenditure £13.89k £49.03k £14.79k £35.12k £13.09k
Income from government contracts £2.50k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.60k £34.24k £33.24k £26.43k N/A