DANELINE INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.12k £24.65k £23.44k £44.81k £68.54k
Total expenditure £14.01k £19.95k £23.40k £31.07k £30.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A