Financial history ONEBILLION LEARNERS

Charity number: 1159480
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.05m £289.56k £4.31m £547.79k £744.24k
Total expenditure £610.11k £626.94k £540.86k £978.35k £630.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £832.04k N/A £3.98m £391 £561.48k
Income - Other trading activities £222.87k N/A £161.16k £300.01k £182.76k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £41.17k £294 £1
Income - Other £0 N/A £129.20k £247.10k £1
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.34k N/A £540.86k £978.35k £630.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds £599.77k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.34k N/A £0 £16.69k £16.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0