BUTSFIELD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 505175
Charity reporting is overdue by 1216 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 August 2020 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 August 2018 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1216 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required