Financial history BUTSFIELD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 505175
Charity reporting is overdue by 352 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £36.44k £12.08k £8.39k £8.02k £0
Total expenditure £8.26k £55.21k £13.69k £3.82k £1.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A N/A