AL EHSAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1159538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 10 August 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 15 September 2020 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 11 January 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 22 July 2018 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2016 05 August 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Not Required