AL EHSAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1159538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/09/2016 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020
Total gross income £6.79k £1.65k £600 £300 £1.30k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A