SECOND CHANCE ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1160126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £110.76k £103.35k £86.99k £86.99k £132.70k
Total expenditure £103.87k £112.56k £83.60k £83.60k £115.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A