SIRIUS MINERALS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1163127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £10.00k £500 £1.99m £16.45k £1.01m
Total expenditure £1.38k £2.55k £310.85k £295.10k £332.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.99m N/A £1.01m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £26.36k N/A £566
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £288.03k N/A £332.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £19.80k N/A £78
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £3.03k N/A £0