Accounts and annual returns THE SKILLS TRAINING & GROWTH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161918
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 August 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required