EDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1160939
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 06 April 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 06 April 2019 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 April 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 May 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 08 May 2017 38 days late Download