FRIENDS OF ST BENEDICTS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1162621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.79k £10.29k £10.64k £15.83k £3.97k
Total expenditure £12.84k £7.05k £13.39k £14.62k £8.25k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A