Financial history INVESTING IN PEOPLE AND CULTURE

Charity number: 1160482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £156.38k £237.18k £314.91k £413.11k £347.47k
Total expenditure £129.10k £237.17k £213.74k £310.28k £273.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £84.13k N/A
Income from government grants £40.85k £46.47k N/A £142.84k £259.82k