THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCH OF ST MARY AND ST PETER TIDENHAM

Charity number: 1159658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £38.37k £13.71k £41.76k £21.23k £9.39k
Total expenditure £33.31k £12.28k £46.23k £25.42k £8.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A