WE MIND THE GAP

Charity number: 1161504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £126.48k £235.60k £377.60k £572.12k £951.32k
Total expenditure £105.22k £166.72k £414.84k £620.84k £857.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £92.57k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £81.00k £180.85k £22.74k £696.05k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £223.86k £204.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £3.92k £11.65k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £696.05k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £344.34k £39.27k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £614.16k £857.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £6.68k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0