THE HUB@BA15

Charity number: 1160807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.23k £20.94k £19.43k £20.46k £31.83k
Total expenditure £12.95k £14.47k £15.60k £15.96k £16.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.50k £7.00k £2.62k N/A £5.50k