Accounts and annual returns CONNECTING STEPS MANCHESTER PROJECT

Charity number: 1164108
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 February 2020 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required