Financial history CONNECTING STEPS MANCHESTER PROJECT

Charity number: 1164108
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.20k £12.71k £10.96k £6.52k £18.89k
Total expenditure £12.98k £12.41k £11.35k £6.25k £11.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.71k N/A N/A £9.00k