WELSH NEWTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 505356
Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 191 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 556 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 556 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required