THE FEOFFEES OF ST MICHAEL'S SPURRIERGATE, YORK

Charity number: 1159025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £139.55k £119.54k £90.74k £79.88k
Total expenditure £0 £124.51k £226.32k £107.47k £82.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A