THE SPIRE ARTS

Charity number: 1165244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 March 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2020 13 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2019 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2018 05 March 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2018 05 March 2019 39 days late Download
Annual return 25 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download