Trustees BLOOD BIKES CUMBRIA
Charity number: 1159026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ernest White | Chair | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles James Payne | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Charles Webster | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Mathieson Beattie | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Hodgson | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENZIL VERNON ADDISON | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Slater | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Houghton | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Walby | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Louise Hetherington | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Thompson Cresswell | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.