THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN CHURCH WHEATLEY

Charity number: 1159100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 May 2016 On time