RADWINTER RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 1160503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.30k £165.22k £74.65k £15.82k £18.04k
Total expenditure £6.53k £10.55k £24.99k £11.62k £21.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.00k
Income from government grants £0 £18.84k £22.69k £6.83k N/A