BISHOP GROSSETESTE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1159461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £200.73k £186.77k £191.14k £189.64k £190.15k
Total expenditure £185.86k £196.26k £188.53k £181.87k £189.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A