LEEN VALLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1161051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 February 2017 8 days late Download