LEEN VALLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1161051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.34k £6.36k £12.69k £6.32k £4.93k
Total expenditure £11.25k £2.86k £10.98k £16.39k £13.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.60k £0 £2.50k £2.00k £2.00k