AXMINSTER SKATEPARK

Charity number: 1161283
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/05/2019 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.72k £81 £8.29k £751 £0
Total expenditure £25 £899 £13.85k £752 £200
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A