IN THE MIX YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1161486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required