Accounts and annual returns THE RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1161196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window