Accounts and annual returns WEST LONDON FREE SCHOOL PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1159396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 October 2020 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 23 October 2020 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 July 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 July 2019 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window