Financial history WEST LONDON FREE SCHOOL PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1159396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £35.96k £41.07k £47.44k £22.77k £13.07k
Total expenditure £68.88k £11.17k £28.64k £24.42k £18.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A