LYCEE INTERNATIONAL DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1160719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.27m £8.72m £10.84m £11.30m £10.97m
Total expenditure £5.62m £8.69m £11.03m £11.53m £11.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £38.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £118.27k £58.77k £59.71k £32.13k £6.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £49.41k £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.15m £8.59m £10.78m £11.21m £10.94m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £19.17k
Income - Other £0 £70.90k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.62m £8.63m £11.03m £11.53m £11.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £32.81k £16.04k £18.93k £13.27k £35.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £54.45k £0 £0 £0