CLARE CASTLE COUNTRY PARK TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1160965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £200.30k £144.70k £394.60k £431.70k £996.58k
Total expenditure £117.20k £128.30k £374.60k £512.70k £314.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £3.00k £3.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.85k £14.00k N/A N/A £891.90k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £905.35k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £24.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £66.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £314.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0