MISS MOLLIES RESCUE

Charity number: 1159985
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £83.37k £59.67k £49.82k £42.93k £40.50k
Total expenditure £42.61k £65.84k £74.79k £44.73k £37.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A