Financial history The Balance Eco Foundation

Charity number: 1162529
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6 £4 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £57 £841 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A