SKILLS &TRAINING NETWORK

Charity number: 1161029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Mohamed Fatouh Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Tasneem Zeenat PERVAIZ Chair 17 September 2017 None on record
Dr MOHAMED ELHAYTHEM ABDELATEY Trustee 12 November 2021 None on record
Maha Galaleldin Trustee 11 February 2016 None on record
Gamalat Abdalla Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Shakiratu Opeyemi Akinleye Trustee 26 February 2021 None on record
Aleih Khazali Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record