Financial history MRS D M FRANCE-HAYHURST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160394
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 30/03/2021
Total gross income £367.80k £382.57k £379.20k £365.29k £421.12k
Total expenditure £353.65k £326.01k £387.11k £345.95k £436.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A