WALSALL PRIDE FOR ALL

Charity number: 1161574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 30 April 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 21 February 2018 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 26 July 2017 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 Not Required