WALSALL PRIDE FOR ALL

Charity number: 1161574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £7.06k £23.14k £10.19k £15.83k £11.91k
Total expenditure £11.95k £23.44k £5.82k £12.56k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £5.00k