SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 505590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 February 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 February 2020 98 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 August 2017 On time Download