ASPERGER LONDON AREA GROUP (ALAG)

Charity number: 1160477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.68k £2.75k £10.74k £10.57k £15.28k
Total expenditure £24.67k £3.18k £3.28k £7.41k £10.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A