THE ANSTICE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1162626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RITA MANNERING Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
JUNE CAMPBELL Trustee 02 July 2019 None on record
Dorothy Mary Menzies Holden Trustee 06 November 2021 None on record
Julie Morgan Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Sarah Anne Rachael Chadwick Chair 28 May 2019 None on record
Stephenie Shinton Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Cllr Janice Jones Trustee 18 August 2020 None on record
Gulchan Bagry Trustee 02 July 2019 None on record