INSIDE OUT FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1160856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.25k £32.50k £37.13k £23.01k £64.24k
Total expenditure £5.22k £24.97k £30.87k £27.57k £64.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A