Accounts and annual returns RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 505630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window