ERDINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1161641
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 January 2017 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 January 2017 64 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)