THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, SARISBURY

Charity number: 1160288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £105.69k £255.45k £68.55k £68.94k £103.83k
Total expenditure £86.80k £398.94k £169.95k £63.39k £102.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.61k