SEACOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505648
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2018 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 January 2018 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required