COMMUNITY HALLS IN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1163728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time Download