Trustees PINNER METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1162556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Dr LYNITA CONRADIE Trustee 01 September 2018
HARROW AND HILLINGDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TERRY FIELD Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
HEATHER MORRIS Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
GBENGER ADENUBI Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Irene Lauder Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Sylvia Agyare Trustee 01 July 2016
THE M K CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr KOFI AGYARE Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
B ARYEE-ADDO Trustee 01 September 2012
HARROW AND HILLINGDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JANET DOBSON Trustee 01 September 1993
None on record
JACK NOTT Trustee 01 September 1993
None on record
IAN MURRAY Trustee 01 September 1993
None on record
IAN GREEN Trustee 01 September 1993
None on record
BETTY STEGGALS Trustee 01 September 1970
None on record